DEXTERS ODYSSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is simple, to help families spend more time together & relieve parents of the additional, as well as unexpected financial challenge of their child going through treatment. Partnering with Bristol Royal Hospital for Children, we provide parents with 4 offerings whilst their child receives treatment; *Coffee Break & Cake *Dexters Hamper *Odyssey Entertainment Package *Help Out Vouchers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW PHILIP LIEBOW | Chair | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Myles Dorian Horton | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Adam Sweeting | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Faye Bridget Perry | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ELLEN LIEBOW | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leila Jayne Morrill Horton | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.27k | £45.73k | £6.65k | £36.42k | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £20.33k | £13.50k | £12.57k | £10.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED, FOR THOSE IN NEED BY WAY OF BEING A CHILD NEWLY DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN THE SOUTHWEST OF ENGLAND, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CARE PACKAGES AND SUPPORTING ONCOLOGY DEPARTMENTS IN THE PROVISION OF PLAY EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Esson Road
BRISTOL
BS15 1NP
- Phone:
- 07563398670
- Email:
- hello@dextersodyssey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window