LONDON THUNDER BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide activities which benefit the community and in particular to provide diversionary activities for disadvantaged young people living in the inner city of London. The company aims to reach those young people who do not normally have access to high quality coaching programmes. Young people will benefit from positive role models and the opportunity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Clark | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Loum | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dejan Paunovic | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADELAINE NIETZOLD | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER MARK BISHAI BSC MSB | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bucknall | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||
PETER LANG | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIKKI SEALY B.ED, M.A. | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.91k | £338.41k | £200.87k | £252.55k | £229.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.69k | £287.56k | £178.59k | £182.59k | £224.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 309 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BASKETBALL; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A STUDY CLUB AND WORK EXPERIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Thunderdome
Unit 2
Stockholm Road
LONDON
SE16 3LP
- Phone:
- 07581011571
- Email:
- steve@thunderbasketball.net
- Website:
-
thunderbasketball.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window