Trustees WHITFORD PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1178955
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tomos Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP PARRY | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Roberts | Trustee | 22 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hughes | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
EMMA Parry-Gibbins | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.