CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST OASIS OF GRACE (CHRIST CHURCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church provides the following services/activities in order to advance the religion:- * weekly religious worship services; * Bible study groups; * weekly prayer meetings and devotional services; * youth group discussions on Christian topics; and * celebration of Christian festivals, including Christmas, Easter and Harvest festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 10 July 2018: CIO registration
- CCC OASIS OF GRACE (CHRIST CHURCH) (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA ISAACS | Chair | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ABE | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATALIA BLAGROVE | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA OLATUNDE | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
AYO IJIDAKINRO | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY LANIYAN | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SOLOMON ALAO | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.19k | £49.11k | £78.00k | £72.98k | £66.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.46k | £31.83k | £77.27k | £75.81k | £66.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7
BELL YARD
HOLBORN
LONDON
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 0207 7312041
- Email:
- ccc_oasisofgrace1@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window