HIGHFIELDS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of Highfields Church is the promotion of Christianity. We run a local church and associated activities including weekly clubs for all ages of children, as well as ministries focussed on Students and Internationals. We support missionaries both in the UK and abroad in order to spread the gospel worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£825,069
Donations and legacies | £764.20k | |
Charitable activities | £43.25k | |
Other trading activities | £4.98k | |
Investments | £6.73k | |
Other | £5.92k |
Total expenditure:
£793,678
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £759.59k | |
Other | £34.09k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £34.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £759.59k | |
Retained for future use | £31.39k |
People

14 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 July 2018: CIO registration
- 25 February 2022: Funds received from 700112 HIGHFIELDS CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Joseph sunday | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Clayton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chen Ng | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Gooderham | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bhakia Raj | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony John Williams | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 25 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Stuart Phillips | Trustee | 25 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rowland Hughes | Trustee | 25 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN DAVID REEVES | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW REES | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID MARTYN GOBBETT | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY CRESSWELL | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £699.16k | £712.31k | £688.68k | £722.95k | £825.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £692.41k | £663.90k | £714.05k | £716.86k | £793.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.62k | £3.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £647.16k | £696.87k | £677.66k | £685.37k | £764.20k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.72k | £5.56k | £3.66k | £2.55k | £4.98k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £36.73k | £7.88k | £6.85k | £29.68k | £43.25k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.56k | £2.00k | £515 | £442 | £6.73k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.91k | £5.92k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £20.68k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £692.41k | £663.90k | £714.05k | £716.86k | £759.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £2.64k | £2.64k | £2.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £155.43k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £34.09k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £784.31k | £779.34k | £759.34k | £732.50k | £715.02k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £312.85k | £366.04k | £370.03k | £388.77k | £435.17k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.48k | £11.30k | £20.67k | £6.47k | £3.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Jul 2018 as amended on 10 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHFIELDS CHURCH
MONTHERMER ROAD
CARDIFF
CF24 4QW
- Phone:
- 02920650740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window