Financial history THOUSANDS BUDDHA UK

Charity Number: 1180572
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.59k £63.66k £24.76k £32.55k £40.06k
Total expenditure £51.58k £30.08k £680 £1.00k £680
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A