THOUSANDS BUDDHA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise awareness and understanding of religious beliefs, practices through leaflets and social media tools; Carry out Buddhist religious teaching. Community Development by promoting volunteering, effective use of charitable resources, civic responsibility etc, and advance Buddhist Arts and Culture as taught by Buddha himself, and promote religious, racial and equality in England & Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 2018: CIO registration
- TBUK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMUNDRA GURUNG | Chair | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWA GYAMJO SYANGBO | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SURENDRA DEV GURUNG | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KRISHNA PARSAD GURUNG | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.59k | £63.66k | £24.76k | £32.55k | £40.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.58k | £30.08k | £680 | £1.00k | £680 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 February 2025 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 February 2025 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 385 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 385 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2025 | 750 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2025 | 750 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 February 2025 | 1115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BUDDHIST PHILOSOPHY. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, FOSTER GOOD COMMUNITY RELATIONSHIP AND PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY AMONGST ALL BUDDHIST LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES, 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AID THE CHARITY MEMBERS IN THEIR NEED OF EXTREME FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR IF THEY ARE UNDER UNDUE STRESS DUE TO THE LOSS OF A FAMILY MEMBER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 WHITLEY RISE
READING
RG2 0NS
- Phone:
- 07342278321
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window