FRIENDS OF PONTARDAWE ARTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to support the artistic and community activities undertaken at Pontardawe Arts Centre. Promoting public interest and education in the arts by supporting and assisting the provision of facilities at the Centre. We seek to provide practical and financial support and volunteering opportunities for the Centre, an important cultural, educational and recreational community hub.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 03 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GRANT LOGAN DUNCAN | Chair | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Puzey | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Heather Pudner | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BOWEN DAVIES M.ED. | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Ann Davies | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JILL ALLISON WILLIAMS M.A. | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PHILIP LLOYD DAVIES LLB | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.46k | £3.79k | £1.39k | £35.59k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.26k | £2.50k | £1.15k | £520 | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN ALL ITS FORMS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT PONTARDAWE ARTS CENTRE AS A CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL CENTRE THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE FRIENDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES, PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Pontardawe Arts Centre
Herbert Street
Pontardawe
SWANSEA
SA8 4ED
- Phone:
- 07813145336
- Email:
- pacfriends1@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window