MALCOLM HART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to build Quiet Rooms for family members visiting family and friends in ICU at Hammersmith Hospital and other hospitals. We raise money by having fundraising events such as cinema film screenings, summer tea parties, football tournaments and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND HART | Chair | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Reissner | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LIA DANIELLE HART | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA REISSNER | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE LEIGH | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
RONIT MICHELLE GERBER | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA CRESE | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA WELKA | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GERRARD | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN ROSS HART | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SILVERSTEIN | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.51k | £2.52k | £334 | £9.31k | £3.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.78k | £19.81k | £1.39k | £1.91k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 August 2022 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2021 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS SUFFERING BLOOD CANCER RELATED DISEASES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE BEING TREATED IN HAEMATOLOGY AND INTENSIVE CARE AT HAMMERSMITH HOSPITAL, LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO ENHANCE THEIR HEALTH AND WELL-BEING FOLLOWING DIAGNOSIS AND DURING TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malcolm Hart Foundation
2B Jordans Way
Bricket Wood
St. Albans
Hertfordshire
AL2 3SL
- Phone:
- 07703360214
- Email:
- natashareissner@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window