BAPCO LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY IMPROVING THE KNOWLEDGE AND USE OF PUBLIC SAFETY TECHNOLOGY AND CRITICAL COMMUNICATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Lucas | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Philip Habberley | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Beeson | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Pemberton | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Leat | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teressa Lorraine Latimer | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darryl Anthony Keen | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Suzanne Jones | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £114.17k | £407.60k | £79.51k | £296.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.19k | £139.81k | £87.98k | £231.42k | £236.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 APR 2019 as amended on 30 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY IMPROVING THE KNOWLEDGE AND USE OF PUBLIC SAFETY TECHNOLOGY AND CRITICAL COMMUNICATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 14 The Stottie Shed
Baker's Yard
Christon Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1XD
- Phone:
- 01912414523
- Email:
- support@bapco.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window