BARAKAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities during first year were limited to providing financial support to orphans and widows. The trustees plan to expand the activities to the other areas of the charity's objectives in the next year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR SALEEM ANWAR | Chair | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUDASSIR TANVEER | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Fawad Siddiqui | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.65k | £24.41k | £16.50k | £30.73k | £32.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.00k | £14.92k | £2.71k | £8.29k | £38.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS NURSERIES, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES, AND THE PROVISION A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAID PERSONS; (2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR FOOD AND SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (5) TO SUPPORT THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY (AND BY DOING SO THE WIDER COMMUNITY) BY PROMOTING GOOD MORALS & CONDUCT AND ADDRESSING AREAS OF SOCIAL CONCERNS, SUCH AS ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, CRIMINALITY, SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN. . (6) TO PROVIDE FREE WORSHIP SERVICES AND OTHER ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS SERVICES SUCH AS PRAYER CONGREGATION, COUNSELLING, MARRIAGE, FUNERAL AND MENTORING BY PROFESSIONALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 High View Parade
Woodford Avenue
ILFORD
Essex
IG4 5EP
- Phone:
- 07771904865
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window