Accounts and annual returns NARBERTH NOBBLERS
Charity Number: 1182417

Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 305 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 305 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 August 2022 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 04 August 2022 | 247 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window