PARENTS' ASSOCIATION OF THE MIKOLAJ REJ POLISH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mikolaj Rej Polish School is a supplementary school and operates across 32 Saturdays a year teaching the Polish Language, Polish history and geography. Children also learn about Polish culture. They attend from nursery until year 12, (from the ages of 3 to 17). The school prepares pupils to sit GCSE and A'level in Polish. the shool is based in Chiswick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 January 2019: CIO registration
- POLSKA SZKOLA CHISWICK (Working name)
- SZKOLA MIKOLAJA REJA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALGORZATA KUT | Chair | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Agnieszka Ptaszynska | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katarzyna Rabsztyn | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lidia Ziolkowska | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Redestowicz | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aneta Paczes | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Napiorkowska | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Dembek | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Piotr Bielak | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
AGATA KUSIAK | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMILIA PIERA | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £230.20k | £126.57k | £141.98k | £141.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £135.92k | £137.74k | £148.38k | £153.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Jan 2019 as amended on 19 Jun 2020 as amended on 16 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE AND FURTHER EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN POLISH LANGUAGE, CULTURE, RELIGION AND TRADITION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL, MIKOLAJ REJ POLISH SCHOOL, TEACHING THE POLISH LANGUAGE, HISTORY AND GEOGRAPHY AND PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, AND; B) ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL TRIPS FOR PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mikolaj Rej Polish School
POSK 238 - 246 King Street
London
W6 0RF
- Phone:
- 07740946954
- Email:
- prezes@psmrej.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window