Financial history NEW LIFE CHURCH (REDCAR)

Charity number: 1178511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.40k £47.12k £53.45k £54.07k £67.72k
Total expenditure £17.71k £22.62k £43.91k £48.08k £48.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A