ADULLAM PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, RELIEVING PHYSICAL & MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Farrow | Chair | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lev Cribb | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Ramm | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Alan Johnstone | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HENDERSON | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Jayne Percival | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.06k | £55.21k | £54.93k | £54.17k | £111.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.02k | £39.78k | £56.98k | £58.84k | £60.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; RELIEVING THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED, BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS OF ANY KIND OR SUFFERING HARDSHIP WHETHER PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT; DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND/OR EMPLOYMENT. THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE MET IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT AT ALL TIME THE CHARITYÆS ACTIVITIES SHALL BE DELIVERED IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Adullam Programme
C/O Hope Church
Queen Street
Lancaster
LA1 1RX
- Phone:
- 07449373979
- Website:
-
adullamprogramme.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window