HAAYA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
our objective is to establish a visionary Masjid and provide a permanent place for our service whic will include youth work community engagement dawah activities interfaith work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 12 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUHEL MIAH | Chair | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
M A Kalam | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Imran Hamid | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Harun Rashid Khan | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Seema Minhas | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PASHA SAFDAR | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2019 | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £780.05k | £190.69k | £306.29k | £364.91k | £334.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.68k | £59.69k | £70.85k | £93.64k | £104.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £768.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £93.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £111.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 APR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE : A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, ESTABLISHMENT OF RELIGIOUS PLACES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAMIC RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAMIC RELIGION. B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING :GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. C) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haaya Foundation
4-6 Hanworth Road
HOUNSLOW
TW3 1UA
- Phone:
- 07947254494
- Website:
-
hounslowmuslimcentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window