CHILDMINDING UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childminding UK provides information, advice and training to Ofsted registered and pre registered childminders, encouraging and supporting them to provide a quality service for children, particularly those under 8, and their families. Support is provided through a website, online training, a membership package and telephone/email support. Childminding UK also represents childminders nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 March 2019: CIO registration
- 12 July 2021: Funds received from 1047565 NORTHAMPTONSHIRE CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
- CHILDMINDING UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Elizabeth Cobb | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivy Rose Owusu-Baah | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Anderson | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Coombes | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Welling | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Mackay | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Honor Edgar | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Linda Baxter | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £151.58k | £200.57k | £208.53k | £247.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £145.51k | £178.60k | £242.00k | £247.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Mar 2019 as amended on 30 Nov 2023 as amended on 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN UNDER AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northamptonshire Childminding Assoc
PO Box 7114
KETTERING
NN16 6BG
- Phone:
- 01536210685
- Email:
- info@childmindinguk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window