The Metta Centre for Trauma Therapy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Metta Centre was founded over ten years ago to make specialist trauma therapy accessible to those who need it most. Our clients are among the most vulnerable people in Oxfordshire, those who do not have the means to pay private fees and cannot access the support they need through the NHS. Today, we provide over 500 hours of low-cost or free therapy for up to 50 clients a year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 February 2019: CIO registration
- MEET IN OXFORD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Humphrey | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Low | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Ann Black | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
NANCY LEE BROWNER | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.95k | £83.06k | £13.16k | £4.23k | £15.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £16.59k | £19.77k | £20.95k | £30.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Feb 2019 as amended on 22 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN OXFORDSHIRE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF TRAUMATIC EXPERIENCES BY THE PROVISION OF THE TRAUMA FOCUSED THERAPIES KNOWN AS EMDR AND THE ENERGY PSYCHOTHERAPIES WITH PRIORITY GIVEN TO PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS BY WAY OF FREE OR SUBSIDISED TREATMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 ST. GILES
OXFORD
OX1 3LW
- Phone:
- 07887248485
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window