GANG WARILY SCOUT & GUIDE HQ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Scouting and Guiding Activities. We maintain our HQ. We put on events for our local community to attend
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bratherton | Chair | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Crann | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Michele Deacon | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Patricia Saward | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £24.75k | £5.16k | £9.89k | £5.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £7.79k | £8.17k | £6.89k | £14.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES KNOWN AS GANG WARILY SCOUT & GUIDE HQ.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gang Warily Scout & Guide HQ
Newlands Road
Fawley
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 1GA
- Phone:
- 07369215777
- Email:
- gwscoutguidehq@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window