THE DOREEN VALIENTE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Doreen Valiente Foundation fulfils its educative role by holding conferences, showing exhibitions, organising talks and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 May 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emlyn Thomas Price | Chair | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marco Romeo-Pitone PhD | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Freedman | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ISABEL MARIA SILVEIRA DA SILVA | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUFUS DOUGLAS HARRINGTON | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Julia Belham-Payne | Trustee | 06 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £9.86k | £9.54k | £11.44k | £16.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.46k | £4.66k | £7.40k | £15.68k | £15.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 APR 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND PRACTICE OF PAGAN RELIGIONS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAINTAINING A COLLECTION OF ARTEFACTS RELATING TO PAGAN BELIEF SYSTEMS AND MAKING THEM AVAILABLE FOR PUBLIC EDUCATION AND DISPLAY IN EDUCATIONAL CONTEXTS, AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Albany Road
READING
RG30 2UL
- Phone:
- 07920858056
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window