MUSIC FOR LIBERIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music for Liberia raises money for children and education in Liberia through music-based fundraising in the UK. Our donations enable our charity partners and beneficiaries to fund crucial work in Liberia, including funding scholarships, supporting rural schools and providing financial relief for educators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Padmore | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Page | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abbas Hussain | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
K. IMBEAH | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £4.77k | £3.84k | £2.07k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £3.37k | £5.17k | £2.57k | £2.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN IN LIBERIA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF POVERTY, DISABILITY, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS IN THE UK BY CREATING HIGH-QUALITY MUSIC EVENTS FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH ARTISTS FROM DIFFERENT CULTURAL AND ARTISTIC BACKGROUNDS; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF YOUNG MUSICIANS IN LONDON BY PROVIDING THEM, THROUGH OUR EVENTS, WITH EDUCATION AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62B
TURNHAM GREEN TERRACE
LONDON
62B
TURNHAM GREEN TERRACE
W41QN
- Phone:
- 07922665530
- Email:
- info@musicforliberia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window