THE ONE HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support within the community of Aspull
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £14,051 from 10 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wigan
Governance
- 08 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Godfrey Nigel Dean | Chair | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Marsh | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE SUMNER | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.32k | £22.56k | £16.88k | £22.32k | £35.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.36k | £9.46k | £14.12k | £14.63k | £29.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £3.89k | £3.97k | £14.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ASPULL, NEW SPRINGS AND WHELLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The One House Community Centre
Haigh Road
Aspull
WIGAN
WN2 1RR
- Phone:
- 01942665770
- Email:
- info@onehouseaspull.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window