KINGDOM GRACE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching the good news of the gospel of Jesus Christ to the public via leaflets, one on one interaction, social media and on the internet. Teaching and encouraging one another to live out the Christ-like life as revealed in the scriptures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2018: Standard registration
- KGM (Working name)
- KGMI (Working name)
- KINGDOM GRACE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDERICK TONTO | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA TONTO | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE YEBOAH | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.76k | £2.34k | £3.00k | £4.57k | £4.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.70k | £1.02k | £5.03k | £3.99k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS), IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DEEM FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
City Road Baptist Church
City Road
BIRMINGHAM
B16 0NE
- Phone:
- 07984354978
- Email:
- info.kgmuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window