240PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
240Project provides a safespace and activity centre for the vulnerable and excluded, particularly those with experience of homelessness. We offer arts, health, counselling and wellbeing groups and activities, internet access, one-to-one practical support, group art trips, wellbeing trips and more. We aim to enrich our members lives and help people out of isolation and into a full vibrant life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 10 October 2018: CIO registration
- 22 January 2019: Funds received from 1053548 NOTTING HILL CHURCHES HOMELESS CONCERN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY CHARLES STEWART MURRAY | Chair | 06 January 1996 |
|
|
||||
Cornelia Grassi | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Christiansen | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francis Fitzgibbon KC | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Treadwell | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fernanda Eberstadt | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.85k | £127.55k | £84.04k | £120.14k | £127.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.78k | £101.31k | £101.38k | £133.77k | £145.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED HOMELESSNESS OR ARE IN HOUSING NEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOTTING HILL METHODIST CHURCH
240 LANCASTER ROAD
LONDON
W11 4AH
- Phone:
- 07908327014
- Email:
- efarrelly@240project.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window