LICHFIELD FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRODUCTION OF ANNUAL MULTI ARTS FESTIVAL IN AND AROUND LICHFIELD AND STAFFORDSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,016 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 January 1982: Standard registration
- LICHFIELD FESTIVAL (Working name)
- THE LICHFIELD FESTIVAL (Working name)
- LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Right Reverend Janet Elizabeth McFarlane | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Wayne Roger Smith | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Rosemary Graham | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Smith | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE TETLEY | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Swallow | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Lue | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Douglas Walker | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|||||
David Shaw | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND MANSELL | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lesley Wiser | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.77k | £116.30k | £345.76k | £422.02k | £417.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.28k | £105.56k | £277.74k | £389.85k | £412.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £12.00k | £15.97k | £1.25k | £8.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 NOVEMBER 1981, 22 MARCH 1994 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 10 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION OF MUSIC, PLAYS, FILMS, EXHIBITIONS, CONCERTS, LECTURES, READINGS AND OTHER SIMILAR CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH PUBLIC FESTIVALS AND SCHEMES THEREFOR. (FOR FURTHER DETIALS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Donegal House
Bore Street
Lichfield
WS13 6NE
- Phone:
- 01543 306270
- Email:
- info@lichfieldfestival.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window