Financial history DE CAVERSMILL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1178367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £16.07k £22.17k £1.96k £21.08k £30.25k
Total expenditure £18.19k £19.93k £1.84k £15.37k £21.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.60k