DE CAVERSMILL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DE Caversmill Theatre Co. provide drama to all ages free of cost, we fund raise to meet all costs at the same time providing the knowledge and experience to improve the stage craft and also the social skills. Also we help to fund raise for others either by providing monies or making there awareness know to others in the community. This could also be providing volunteers to help out too.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £3,602 from 11 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 14 May 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE FOX-CROWTHER | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Sale | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE HILL | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MILLS | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN HILL | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY RUSSELL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEE CROWTHER | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.07k | £22.17k | £1.96k | £21.08k | £30.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.19k | £19.93k | £1.84k | £15.37k | £21.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DRAMATIC ART AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART BY THE PROVISION OF A THEATRE AND FACILITIES FOR THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES. 2) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY THE PROVISION OF DONATIONS AND GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 LANGLAND DRIVE
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST3 4DA
- Phone:
- 01782316299
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window