PADDOCK WOOD U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The U3A members share their knowledge and talents freely with each other in informal learning interest groups. They create their own opportunities to learn in the ways that suit members best. As a result, members contribute to a wide range of engaging and stimulating interest groups in an atmosphere of mutual support and companionship. Members study not for qualifications but for enjoyment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 18 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven John Hann | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Warner | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fred Lemont | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor George Sampson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Trevor Carney | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MACKINLAY LYNN | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Fearnley | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Smith | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry William Ednie | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
WENDY WOLLEN | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN CARNEY | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.71k | £12.24k | £39.95k | £38.91k | £50.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.40k | £12.20k | £33.97k | £34.60k | £48.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 SEP 2018 as amended on 12 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, IN PADDOCK WOOD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Kingsmead Park
Church Road
Paddock Wood
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 6HE
- Phone:
- 01892 835575
- Email:
- info@paddockwoodu3a.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window