WAVES ADDITIONAL NEEDS SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WAVES provides a variety of indoor/outdoor activities suitable for a range of ages (0-25yrs).We have sports, bikes, scooters, cookery, independence training, crafts, hair and beauty, consoles,2 pool tables, a chill room, music, dance, yoga, boxing and general fitness activities. We also offer swimming, seasonal parties, special events and activities concerning science/skills and nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 13 September 2018: Standard registration
- 11 August 2020: Funds received from 1101913 SPECIAL NEEDS INTEGRATED PLAY SCHEME
- WAVES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNE HELEN JACKSON | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kate Price | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
carole Linda Greener | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Devlin | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Stephen | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Anne Tate | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Campbell | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leoni Taylor | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Bagley | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Denny | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE WALLACE | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAUL BAGLEY | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL JANE MORETON | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STUART WALLACE | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.46k | £74.38k | £64.03k | £41.87k | £71.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.33k | £32.16k | £78.05k | £54.25k | £49.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED ON 12 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIED OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS, AND THEIR SIBLINGS IN NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY:- 1)PROVIDING A SAFE, SUPPORTIVE AND NON-JUDGEMENTAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THEM TO PLAY; 2)PROVIDING WEEKLY ACTIVITIES TO THE CHILDREN TO HELP DEVELOP THEIR SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL SKILLS WHICH WILL SUPPORT EMPOWERING THEIR EMOTIONAL WELLBEING; AND 3)TO OFFER SUPPORT / ADVICE AND FRIENDSHIP TO THE PARENTS/CARERS OF THE ABOVE CHILDREN AS WELL AS SIGNPOSTING TO SPECIALIST SUPPORT AVAILABLE IN THE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Whiteleas Way
South Shields
NE34 8LH
- Phone:
- 07877008962
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window