C.A.S.T.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist asylum-seekers and refugees and new members of our community, offering advice and support and signposting them to appropriate services; and liaise with local community and statutory organisations and are active in night shelters and the Southend Homeless Action Network. At the same time, CAST is an activist organisation that challenges existing structures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 21 December 2018: Standard registration
- COMMUNITIES AND SANCTUARY-SEEKERS TOGETHER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WASHINGTON ALI- NASOLO | Chair | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TSEBO LETSIE | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GORA | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES DLIWAYO | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.19k | £253.79k | £385.75k | £348.22k | £401.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.78k | £234.20k | £386.81k | £439.42k | £403.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
27 July 2021 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE. 4. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Queens Road
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS1 1NL
- Phone:
- 01702436659
- Email:
- info@castsanctuaryuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window