Accounts and annual returns CANOLFAN GLANHWFA CYF

Charity Number: 1180027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 18 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 19 April 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 19 April 2024 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 May 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 05 May 2023 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 September 2021 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required