AL-IKRAM BURIAL SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELP THOSE LOST MEMBER OF FAMILIES, PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR BURIAL AND TRANSPORTATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDELALIM SAID BAYAN | Chair | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
KAMIL IDRIS HAMID | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABDULRAZAK MUSA GETUO IBRAHIM | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/03/2020 | 21/03/2021 | 21/03/2022 | 21/03/2023 | 21/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £13.05k | £14.36k | £51.69k | £27.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76 | £4.16k | £14.36k | £13 | £10.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
21 March 2024
(These accounts |
30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 March 2022 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 March 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BEREAVED PEOPLE IN BIRMINGHAM WHO LACK THE FINANCIAL MEANS TO MEET THE COSTS OF FUNERAL EXPENSES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST WITH SUCH COSTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFFICE 1
465 Coventry Road
Small Heath
BIRMINGHAM
B10 0TJ
- Phone:
- 07727128966
- Email:
- alikramburial@gmail.com
- Website:
-
WWW.ALIKRAMBURIAL.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window