Trustees BANCROFT MILL ENGINE MUSEUM
Charity number: 1181038

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Herbert Maudsley | Chair | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Ridley | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Church | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myra Shan McKay | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Ingleby Whipp | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Preston | Trustee | 16 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Pilling | Trustee | 26 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kendrick Nixon M.A | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Garford | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.