RAILSIDE COMMUNITY GARDEN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Railside Community Garden CIO was set by local residents in Streatham SW16 in 2018 to co-ordinate the use of some unused land next to the railway, and turn it into a Community Garden. During 2019 and 2020 the RCG has successfully landscaped the area, built planters, grown a wide variety of veg, started a regular supply to a foodbank, and is establishing itself as a community asset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 31 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Sheila Francoise CREES | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin York | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ailbhe Phelan | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kay Veronica TROTTER | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline GRIDLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA WINDSOR WAITE | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert JONES | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £1.64k | £3.51k | £4.16k | £9.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.82k | £2.42k | £3.20k | £1.43k | £9.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN STREATHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF SUSTAINABLE HORTICULTURE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 7 Harborough Road
LONDON
SW16 2XP
- Phone:
- 07790299282
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window