EXMOUTH CERAMIC GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group has existed for 50 years and has just over 50 members who join together to learn new and exciting ceramic techniques, how to make glazes, fire and maintain pottery equipment including kilns. We also hold pottery for pleasure classes and participate in community events including the local festival. During the pandemic we have continued to meet as trustees, members, committee virtually
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 09 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antony John Steiner | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Best | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Thomas | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE MOFFATT | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NORMA GILLSON | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE LOUISE MEDLOCK | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DOUGLAS MIDDLETON | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.88k | £3.72k | £14.32k | £20.37k | £18.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.12k | £6.04k | £9.19k | £15.31k | £21.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF CERAMIC ARTS AND CRAFT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, DEMONSTRATIONS AND OTHER TRAINING IN CERAMICS. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 GULLIFORD COTTAGES
EXMOUTH ROAD
LYMPSTONE
EXMOUTH
EX8 5AQ
- Phone:
- 01395279952
- Email:
- exmouthceramics@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window