SUTTON-ON-HULL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE A PLACE OF SPIRITUAL ENRICHMENT FOR THE COMMUNITY, A MEETING PLACE OF PEACE, FRIENDSHIP AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC IN SUTTON ON HULL AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 23 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEBORAH MARGARET LUCAS | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN CALVER | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MARY CALVER | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Langdale | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Robin Edward Siddle | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FIONA HOUGHTON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DIXON | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Bettley | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||
ANGELA MEADLEY | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PARKER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
DEACON SUSAN LANGDALE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA DYSON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
JIM MASLEN | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
PHILIP PLUMB | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA WHITTON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY WINFIELD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BETTLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.53k | £77.06k | £41.46k | £52.92k | £57.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.96k | £52.44k | £46.36k | £51.86k | £48.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 HIGHFIELD
SUTTON-ON-HULL
HULL
HU7 4TW
- Phone:
- 01482374297
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window