CUFFLEY DAY CARE CENTRE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to relieve the needs of elderly people resident in the Cuffley and surrounding area by the provision of a day care centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
Total income includes £114,284 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 November 2018: Standard registration
- 11 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- CUFFLEY DAY CARE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.38k | £101.66k | £172.21k | £134.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.89k | £69.83k | £155.07k | £195.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.20k | £59.01k | £114.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN CUFFLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CENTRE PROVIDING CARE, ACTIVITIES, SERVICES OR FACILITIES IN A SOCIAL DAY CARE SETTING DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS AND SUPPORT INDEPENDENT LIVING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window