ST MARY THE VIRGIN ESTATE MANAGEMENT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to administer and manage the property in its care. The income of the Estate Charity is to be applied as follows: 1. Making small awards made under the governing scheme 2. For the benefit of Newcastle Royal Grammar School - 53% of the balance 3. As to the remainder for the related Almshouses Charity for the running of two residential homes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 14 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Watson Kyle | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Nancye Amey | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Birkmyre | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Nigel Robert Paton | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Lightley | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr HAZEL JONES-LEE | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|||||
CLAIRE STEPHANIE PENN | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GILES CURSON HUNTER | Trustee | 14 August 1979 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £460.01k | £440.56k | £442.19k | £457.16k | £461.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £460.01k | £440.56k | £442.19k | £457.16k | £461.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02/04/1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE ESTATE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OUT OF THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE ESTATE CHARITY (A) £400 TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OR PRIEST IN CHARGE OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MATTHEW AND SAINT MARY THE VIRGIN, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE FOR HIS OWN USE AND BENEFIT, AND (B) £1000 TO THE DIRECTORS OF THE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR APPLICATION IN ADVANCING THE FULL-TIME FURTHER EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25. 53% OF RESIDUE TO THE GOVERNORS OF THE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND 47% OF RESIDUE TO ALMSHOUSE TRUSTEES. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINCOFFS LLP
5 OSBORNE TERRACE
JESMOND
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1SQ
- Phone:
- 07818001884
- Email:
- TGRAY@MINCOFFS.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window