BOGNOR REGIS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching;baptism, evangelism and mission, the teaching, encouragement, welcome & inclusion of young people; nurture and growth of Christian disciples;education and training for Christian and community service;pastoral care;supporting,encouraging charitable social action in the UK & abroad;encouraging relationships with & supporting other Christians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,625 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 July 2018: CIO registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1133946 BOGNOR REGIS BAPTIST CHURCH
- The Shore Community Church (Working name)
- OPENGATE BAPTIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- OPENGATE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMIE STEPHEN JOHN FREDRICKS | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas Copeland | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Attwell | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Doherty | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE KAREN PASSMORE | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Clark | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Lacey | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bolton | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £211.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £191.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOGNOR REGIS BAPTIST CHURCH
73 VICTORIA DRIVE
BOGNOR REGIS
PO21 2TD
- Phone:
- 01243821891
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window