Trustees BOGNOR REGIS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1179247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMIE STEPHEN JOHN FREDRICKS Chair 08 March 2018
None on record
Stephen Thomas Copeland Trustee 06 March 2025
None on record
Paul Attwell Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Kim Doherty Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
JULIE KAREN PASSMORE Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Daniel Clark Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
David Lacey Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Sandra Bolton Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record