Financial history FERNDALE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1180250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.21k £0 £0 £0 £49.92k
Total expenditure £365.44k £364.83k £393.02k £394.34k £339.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A