HOMELESS IN PRESTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 January 1982: Standard registration
- 14 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- H I P (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.53k | £22.75k | £21.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.85k | £17.43k | £31.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 08 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 26 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 26 August 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JANUARY 1982.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION FOR HOMELESS PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN PRESTON, PARTICULARLY VAGRANTS, ALCOHOLICS, DRUG-ADDICTS AND OTHER IN URGENT NEED OF SHELTER.
Area of benefit
PRESTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window