INTERNATIONAL EMERGENCY TEAM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the CIO / charity are the protection and preservation of life/infrastructure/environment by promoting efficient, cost effective and coordinated delivery of emergency service assistance, including but not exclusively the provision of training and service development advice, to help more effectively reduce loss of life and injury in developing countries worldwide. Plus UK communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Colombia
- India
- Libya
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Sri Lanka
- Syria
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 24 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mehrban Sadiq | Chair | 20 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Muhammad Naveed Anwar | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iris Weber | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nasir Jamil | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Iqbal Sayed | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andreas Kotter | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD AMEEN ALI | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DARYL PAUL OPREY | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £62 | £8.14k | £1.69k | £3.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £0 | £416 | £566 | £2.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 360 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PROMOTING EFFICIENT, COST EFFECTIVE AND COORDINATED DELIVERY OF EMERGENCY SERVICES AID, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND SERVICE DEVELOPMENT ADVICE AND FACILITATING PARTNERSHIPS, JOINT PROJECTS AND DEVELOPMENT OF BEST PRACTICE GUIDANCE FOR THE DELIVERY OF EMERGENCY SERVICES AID TO HELP REDUCE LOSS OF LIFE AND INJURIES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES WORLDWIDE CAUSED BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FIRES, ACCIDENTS AND DISASTERS. 2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20
Stocksfield Avenue
Fenham
NE5 2DX
- Phone:
- 07500888759
- Email:
- info@ietuk.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window