PEBBLES-UGANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through regular donations: We help with school fees for children of poor families; Support a feeding programme for children who attend a school in the Wabigalo slum in Kampala; Provide grants for the provision and maintenance of clean drinking water in the school; Provide micro finance grants for slum dwellers to start/ expand their businesses to become self sustaining.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER LEACH | Chair | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Martin Lunnemann | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Couzens | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.39k | £9.99k | £5.66k | £12.85k | £11.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £6.76k | £8.63k | £10.29k | £10.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN UGANDA, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN AND ADULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Victor Jackson Avenue
Poundbury
Dorchester
DT1 3GY
- Phone:
- 01305246250
- Email:
- cncleach@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window