WIRRAL GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS,AFFILIATED TO THE INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice and guidance to Associate Members on how best to obtain the necessary skills to pass the Institutes Advanced Driving Test.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 January 1982: Standard registration
- WIRRAL ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Working name)
- WIRRAL GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TONY STOPFORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Derek Jeffries | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Bolland | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE CHARLETT | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guy Lightfoot | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mark Richards | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH SCARFF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £3.36k | £3.45k | £3.15k | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £1.01k | £1.18k | £3.48k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 1981,AS AMENDED 29 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
(A)TO IMPLEMENT THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE INSTITUTE WAS FORMED, NAMELY TO ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN ROAD SAFETY BY HELPING MOTORISTS AND MOTORCYCLISTS TO PASS THE ADVANCED TEST AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE GROUP SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS(B)TO ORGANISE MEETINGS AND EVENTS OPEN TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC(C)TO ISSUE A NEWSLETTER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 HEATHFIELD ROAD
BRIGHTON-LE-SANDS
LIVERPOOL
L22 6RF
- Phone:
- 07921663220
- Email:
- info@wirraliam.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window