NO 2 BULLYING @ WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information, advice and support to employees affected by bullying at work. Providing guidance to employers who want to remove bullying from the workplace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PANKAJ VEKRIA | Chair | 21 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA SCHECK | Trustee | 21 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 423 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 789 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 25 June 2023 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1154 days | |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 25 June 2023 | 815 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1519 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF EMPLOYEES AFFECTED BY BULLYING WITHIN THE WORKPLACE BY: · THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY TO EMPLOYEES AFFECTED BY BULLYING WITHIN THE WORKPLACE; · RAISING AWARENESS, PROVIDING GUIDANCE AND EDUCATION TO EMPLOYERS ON DEALING WITH AND SUPPORTING EMPLOYEES AFFECTED BY BULLYING WITH A VIEW TO REMOVING BULLYING FROM THE WORKPLACE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lan2Lan House
Brook Way
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT22 7NA
- Phone:
- 07368 606670
- Website:
-
WWW.NO2BULLYINGATWORK.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window