Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF STALYBRIDGE WAR MEMORIAL

Charity number: 1180138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2025 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window