Financial history CHINESE COMMUNITY WELLBEING SOCIETY

Charity number: 1181750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £494.50k £282.33k £503.64k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £253.12k £352.74k £415.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £263.09k £207.76k £171.70k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £59.07k £34.69k £46.23k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.03k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.82k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £492.90k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.89k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £415.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0