Trustees CHINESE COMMUNITY WELLBEING SOCIETY
Charity number: 1181750

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Zheng Feei Ma | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Royston Griffey | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Sunny Chan | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Siu Kuen Ting | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yee Kiu Wan | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Fung-Ming Choi | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Po Lin Ho | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
POH HOOI TEOH | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
YEE KWAN LO | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.