ROCKMOUNT FRIENDS AND COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association is to advance the education and wellbeing of pupils in Rockmount Primary School, in particular by: - Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents, others associated with the school and external stakeholders. - Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education and wellbeing of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 08 October 2018: Standard registration
- RFC (Working name)
- ROCKMOUNT FRIENDS AND COMMUNITY (RFC) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CORRIE JAMIE THOM | Chair | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATIE LOUISE WRIGLEY | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALICE ROSE MCCLYMONT | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.29k | £4.22k | £1.98k | £9.58k | £13.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £7.62k | £1.69k | £5.71k | £20.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF PUPILS IN ROCKMOUNT PRIMARY SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS, OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND EXTERNAL STAKEHOLDERS. 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rockmount Primary School
Rockmount Road
LONDON
SE19 3ST
- Phone:
- 07712655481
- Email:
- rfc.charity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window